MS HB1096 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 67-1-51, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Issuance Of Temporary Theatre Permits Under The Local Option Alcoholic Beverage Control Law; To Provide That A Temporary Theatre Permit May Be Issued To A Charitable Nonprofit Organization That Owns Or Operates A Theatre Facility That Features Plays And Other Theatrical Performances And Productions; To Provide That Such A Permit Shall Authorize The Sale Of Alcoholic Beverages To Patrons Of The Theatre During Performances And Productions At The Theatre Facility For Consumption During Such Performances And Productions On The Premises Of The Facility; To Authorize The Issuance Of Charter Ship Operator's Permits Under The Local Option Alcoholic Beverage Control Law; To Provide That A Charter Ship Operator's Permit Shall Authorize The Holder Thereof And Its Employees To Serve, Monitor, Store And Otherwise Control The Serving And Availability Of Certain Alcoholic Beverages To Customers Of The Permit Holder During Private Charters Under Contract Provided By The Permit Holder; To Provide That A Charter Ship Operator's Permit Shall Authorize Such Action By The Permit Holder And Its Employees Only As To Alcoholic Beverages Brought Onto The Permit Holder's Ship By Customers Of The Permit Holder As Part Of A Private Charter Under Contract; To Provide That A Ship Operator's Permit Shall Not Authorize The Permit Holder To Make Alcoholic Beverages Available To Customers, Except As Authorized In This Act; To Amend Section 27-71-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide The Privilege Tax Required For The Issuance Of A Temporary Theatre Permit And A Ship Operator's Permit; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; authorize temporary permit for performances at certain theatres and chartership operator's permit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 78 N: 38 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 39 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 71 N: 40 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 78 N: 38 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 39 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 71 N: 40 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-30 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-29 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-28 | Senate | Conferees Named Chassaniol,Tindell,Butler (36th) |
2015-03-23 | House | Conferees Named Smith (39th),Zuber,Crawford |
2015-03-17 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Amended |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Tourism |
2015-02-06 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-02-05 | House | Passed |
2015-02-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |