MS HB1126 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 47-5-198, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Prohibition Against Any Person, Except For Correctional Staff, Who Is Convicted Of The Sale, Possession Or Use Of A Controlled Substance Within A Correctional Facility From Earning Time Allowance Or Any Other Reduction Of Sentence; To Provide That Any Correctional Staff Who Is Convicted Of The Sale, Possession Or Use Of A Controlled Substance Within A Correctional Facility Shall Not Be Eligible For Any Type Reduction Of Sentence Or Early Release; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Correctional facilities; provide certain penalties for correctional staff who introduce controlled substances into.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Corrections |
2018-02-12 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-07 | House | Passed As Amended |
2018-02-07 | House | Amended |
2018-01-30 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-15 | House | Referred To Corrections |