MS HB1220 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Mississippi Health Benefit Exchange Act; To Provide The Purpose And Intent Of The Act; To Provide Definitions For The Act; To Establish The Exchange As An Agency Of The State Of Mississippi; To Provide The Requirements For The Exchange; To Allow The Exchange To Charge Assessments Or User Fees To Health Carriers To Generate Funding Necessary To Support The Exchange; To Authorize The Mississippi Insurance Department To Promulgate Regulations For The Implementation And Enforcement Of The Act; To Amend Section 5-3-53, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Certain Numbering; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Health Benefit Exchange Act; create.
Sponsors
Rep. Dirk Dedeaux [D] | Rep. Robert Johnson [D] | Rep. Walter Robinson [D] | Rep. Mary Ann Stevens [D] |
Rep. Tom Weathersby [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 82 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 82 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Died In Conference | |
2011-03-17 | Conferees Named Clarke,Bryan,Kirby | |
2011-03-16 | Conferees Named Robinson,Jones (111th),Johnson | |
2011-03-08 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2011-03-03 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-03-02 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-02 | Amended | |
2011-02-28 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-02-24 | DR - TSDPAA: IN To PH | |
2011-02-17 | Referred To Insurance;Public Health and Welfare | |
2011-02-10 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-09 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2011-02-07 | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Scott, Robinson, Jones (111th), Johnson, Dedeaux) | |
2011-02-07 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-02-07 | Amended | |
2011-02-02 | Tabled Subject To Call | |
2011-02-02 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-01-24 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Insurance |