MS HB1226 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Capitol Complex Improvement District; To Require The Executive Director Of The Department Of Finance And Administration To Implement, Supervise And Administer Certain Infrastructure Improvement Projects Within The City Of Jackson, Mississippi; To Authorize The Executive Director To Employ Persons As He Or She Considers Necessary For The Proper Supervision And Administration Of Improvement Projects Funded Under This Act; To Provide That The Department Of Finance And Administration Shall Develop A Comprehensive Plan For Improvement Projects In The City Of Jackson In Consultation With The Capitol Complex Improvement District Project Advisory Committee; To Provide That Such Plan Shall Attempt To Incorporate The Needs Of The City Of Jackson, The Department Of Finance And Administration, Jackson State University, The University Of Mississippi Medical Center, The Mississippi Department Of Archives And History, And The Commission Established By The City Of Jackson Pursuant To Section 27-65-241; To Require Improvement Projects Undertaken Under This Act To Comport With The Plan; To Provide That The Plan May Be Updated At Any Time And Shall Be Completely Updated Every Five Years; To Create The State Capitol Infrastructure Fund Project Advisory Committee And Provide For Its Membership; To Create The State Capitol Infrastructure Fund, Into Which Shall Be Deposited The Money Specified In Section 27-65-75 And Such Other Money From Whatever Source Derived; To Provide That An Amount Not To Exceed 5% Of The Amount Deposited Into The Fund May Be Utilized To Fund The Administrative Expenses Incurred By The Department Of Finance And Administration In Performing Its Duties Under This Act; To Provide That An Amount Not To Exceed 10% Of The Amount Deposited Into The Fund May Be Utilized To Compensate The City Of Jackson For General Police And Fire Protection Provided By The City; To Provide That An Amount Of Not Less Than 85% Of The Amount Deposited Into The Fund Shall Be Utilized Within The District For Improvement Projects; To Provide That The City Of Jackson Shall Provide Police Coverage For Major Events Conducted Within The District And Shall Maintain All Completed Improvement Projects Within The District; To Amend Section 27-65-75, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Divert A Certain Percentage Of The Total Sales Tax Revenue Collected On Business Activities Within The City Of Jackson, And To Provide That The Revenue So Collected Shall Be Deposited Into The State Capitol Infrastructure Fund; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Capitol Complex Improvement District; create and fund improvement projects within.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 105 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 45 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 109 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 99 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 105 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 45 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 109 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 99 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-04-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2017-03-29 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2017-03-28 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2017-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Conferees Named Polk,Burton,Blount |
2017-03-21 | House | Conferees Named Read,Denny,Wooten |
2017-03-14 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Amended |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2017-02-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-02-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2017-02-09 | House | Amended |
2017-02-09 | House | Reconsidered |
2017-02-01 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Wooten, Read, Huddleston (15th)) |
2017-02-01 | House | Passed As Amended |
2017-02-01 | House | Amended |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2017-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2017-01-16 | House | Referred To Appropriations |