MS HB1335 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit Any Person From Selling A Motor Vehicle Unless The Title And Registration Of The Vehicle Is In The Name Of That Person; To Provide Exceptions; To Provide That A Violation Of This Provision Is A Misdemeanor; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; make unlawful to sell without title and registration in name of owner unless dealer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-03-30 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Conferees Named Simmons (13th),Fillingane,Butler (38th) |
2013-03-25 | House | Conferees Named Johnson,DeLano,Steverson |
2013-03-19 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Amended |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Tabled Subject To Call |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |
2013-02-20 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-02-15 | House | Amended |
2013-02-15 | House | Reconsidered |
2013-02-13 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Johnson, Massengill) |
2013-02-13 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-02-13 | House | Amended |
2013-02-13 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To Transportation |