MS HB1393 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 73-17-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On The Licensure Requirements For Nursing Home Administrators; To Exempt Certain Licensees Of The State Department Of Mental Health As A Mental Health/intellectual Disability Program Administrator From The Requirement Of Licensure As A Nursing Home Administrator; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Nursing home administrators; extend repealer on licensure requirements for.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Formby [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-31 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-29 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Conferees Named Kirby,Burton,Blount |
2015-03-23 | House | Conferees Named Formby,Huddleston (15th),Mims |
2015-03-16 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Amended |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |
2015-02-06 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-02-06 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-02-06 | House | Passed |
2015-01-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-29 | House | DR - TSDP: PH To RU |
2015-01-27 | House | DR - TSDP: RU To PH |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred To Rules;Public Health and Human Services |