MS HB1415 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Coahoma County, Mississippi, To Contribute Funds To Tri-county Workforce Alliance; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Coahoma County; authorize contributions to Tri-County Workforce Alliance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2017-02-16 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed |
2017-02-15 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2017-02-14 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2017-01-16 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |