MS HB1456 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation From Special Funds In The State Treasury For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The State Board Of Medical Licensure For The Fiscal Year 2015.
Title
Appropriation; Medical Licensure, Board of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-04-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-30 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2014-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2014-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2014-03-29 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Burton,Jackson (32nd) |
2014-03-25 | House | Conferees Named Frierson,Huddleston (15th),Denny |
2014-03-21 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Amended |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2014-02-25 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2014-02-19 | House | Passed |
2014-02-19 | House | Amendment Failed |
2014-02-18 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-02-17 | House | Referred To Appropriations |