MS HB1484 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-18 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-18 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-21-105, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A Youth Court Judge May Not Designate An Employee Of The Mississippi Department Of Human Services As His Or Her Designee; To Amend Section 43-21-257, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Administrative Office Of Courts, Rather Than The Office Of Youth Services Of The Department Of Human Services, To Maintain The State Central Registry Of Youth Court Cases Through The Mississippi Youth Court Information Delivery System (mycids); And For Related Purposes.
Title
Youth services under Department of Services; make technical amendments for.
Sponsors
Rep. Joey Hood [R] | Rep. Kathy Sykes [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-18 | House | Died On Calendar |
2016-04-18 | House | Conferees Named Dixon,Eubanks,Tullos |
2016-03-30 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Amended |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2016-03-17 | Senate | DR - TSDPAA: JA To AP |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A;Appropriations |
2016-03-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-03-03 | House | Passed |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2016-02-25 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-02-19 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred To Youth and Family Affairs |