MS HB1572 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 816, Local And Private Laws Of 1991, As Last Amended By Chapter 964, Local And Private Laws Of 2007, To Revise The Terms Of Years That Committee Members Of The Washington County Convention And Visitors Committee May Serve; To Provide That Committee Members Shall Not Serve More Than Two Consecutive Terms; To Require The Committee To Allocate And Pay A Certain Amount To The County In Consideration For The Use Of County Facilities And Support Services; To Extend The Date Of Repeal On The Committee; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Washington County; extend repealer on Washington County Convention and Visitors Committee and revise terms of committee members.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hines [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-03-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-28 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-03-28 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-28 | Passed | |
2011-03-27 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-03-25 | DR - TSDP: LP To FI | |
2011-03-24 | Referred To Local and Private;Finance | |
2011-03-24 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-03-24 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-24 | Passed | |
2011-03-24 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-03-24 | DR - TSDPCS: WM To LP | |
2011-03-23 | DR - TSDPCS: LP To WM | |
2011-03-18 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation;Ways and Means |