MS HB1603 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Declare That The Records And Proceedings Of An Organ Procurement Organization Peer Review Committee Are Confidential And Not Discoverable In A Civil Action; To Define Certain Terms; To Describe The Functions Of Peer Review Committees; To Provide That Persons Providing Information To And Members Of A Peer Review Committee May Not Be Held Liable For Actions Taken By The Committee; To Prohibit A Peer Review Committee And Its Members From Revealing The Identity Of Organ Donors And Recipients; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Organ procurement organizations; records and proceedings of PEER review committees are confidential and not discoverable.
Sponsors
Rep. Casey Eure [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2024-03-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-13 | House | Passed |
2024-03-13 | House | Amendment Tabled |
2024-02-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |