MS HB1622 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Establish The "commercial Vehicle Towing Advisory Committee" Within The Commercial Transportation Enforcement Division Of The Mississippi Department Of Public Safety; To Provide For The Committee's Membership Composition, Terms Of Service And Prescribe Its Powers And Duties; To Provide For The Regulation Of Nonconsensual Towing And Charges For Commercial Motor Vehicles; To Establish Regulations For Towing And Recovery Service Providers; To Establish A Resolution Process For Commercial Motor Vehicle Owners Who Dispute The Amount Of Towing And Recovery Fees And Charges; To Require The Committee To Approve Towing Rates Based On Certain Standards; To Provide For Disciplinary Action Against Towing And Recovery Service Providers For Violations; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Towing of commercial vehicles; regulate the nonconsensual towing of by towing and recovery services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |
2024-03-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-14 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2024-03-06 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Holloway (76th), Horan, Owen) |
2024-03-06 | House | Passed |
2024-03-06 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-02-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |