MS HB1624 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Conference Report Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Conference Report Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Establish State Standards And Operating Procedures For Local Court-appointed Special Advocate (casa) Programs; To Define Certain Terms; To Authorize A Youth Court Judge To Establish A Local Casa Program Governed By A Local Board Of Directors And To Prescribe The Board's Powers; To Require The State Casa Association To Provide Support Services To Local Casa Programs; To Create The Mississippi Casa Network Fund In The State Treasury And To Direct The Deposit Of Certain Monies Into The Fund; To Establish Minimum Requirements For Local Casa Volunteers; To Require The Clerk Of Court To Perform Certain Duties In Relation To Casa Volunteers Appointed To A Court Case; To Prescribe The Duties Of A Casa Volunteer Assigned To A Case; To Create A State Court-appointed Special Advocate (casa) Association; To Prescribe The State Association's Duties; To Authorize The Board Of Directors Of The Association To Employ A Director And To Establish Qualifications For The Director; To Authorize The Administrative Office Of Courts To Provide Secretarial And Support Services To The Association; To Require Local Casa Programs To Submit Specified Data To The Association; To Amend Section 99-19-73, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The State Assessment Imposed For Drug Violations For The Support Of The Mississippi Foster Care Fund; To Amend Sections 43-21-121 And 43-21-261, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity To The Provisions Of This Act; To Bring Forward Section 37-26-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Creates The Mississippi Foster Care Fund And Prescribes The Purposes For Which Monies In The Fund May Be Expended, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Court-Appointed Special Advocate (CASA) Program; create state associate and standardize operations of local programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2024-04-29 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Conferees Named Wiggins,Simmons (12th),Thompson |
2024-04-16 | House | Conferees Named Hood,Yates,Fondren |
2024-04-15 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2024-03-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-12 | House | Passed |
2024-03-12 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 26 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 21 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 21 | 261 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
99 | 19 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |