MS HB1646 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The Office Of State Public Defender Of The State Of Mississippi For The Fiscal Year 2014.
Title
Appropriation; State Public Defender, Office of.
Sponsors
Rep. Herb Frierson [R] | Rep. Robert Johnson [D] | Rep. Linda Coleman [D] | Rep. Earle Banks [D] |
Rep. Toby Barker [R] | Rep. Charles Beckett [R] | Sen. Scott DeLano [R] | Rep. Blaine Eaton [D] |
Rep. Bobby Shows [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-01 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-03-30 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Horhn,Blount |
2013-03-25 | House | Conferees Named Frierson,Johnson,Watson |
2013-03-20 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Amended |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2013-02-26 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-20 | House | Passed |
2013-02-19 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred To Appropriations |