MS HB1651 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The Department Of Archives And History, For The Fiscal Year 2014; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Appropriation; Archives and History, Department of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-31 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-03-30 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Wilemon,Sojourner |
2013-03-25 | House | Conferees Named Frierson,Moore,Patterson |
2013-03-20 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Amended |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2013-02-26 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-26 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2013-02-21 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Gipson, Frierson, Huddleston (15th)) |
2013-02-20 | House | Passed |
2013-02-19 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred To Appropriations |