MS HB1710 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Making An Appropriation From General Funds In The State Treasury For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The Mississippi Public Service Commission For The Fiscal Year 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; Public Service Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-06 Approved by Governor
2020-06-29SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-29HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-27SenateConference Report Adopted
2020-06-27HouseConference Report Adopted
2020-06-26SenateConference Report Filed
2020-06-26HouseConference Report Filed
2020-06-22SenateConferees Named Hopson,Turner-Ford,Chism
2020-06-22HouseConferees Named Read,Bounds,Watson
2020-06-17HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2020-06-15SenateReturned For Concurrence
2020-06-12SenatePassed As Amended
2020-06-12SenateAmended
2020-06-11SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2020-06-03SenateReferred To Appropriations
2020-05-27HouseTransmitted To Senate
2020-05-27HouseImmediate Release
2020-05-27HousePassed
2020-05-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-05-26HouseReferred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback