MS HB1725 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 938, Local And Private Laws Of 2011, As Amended By Chapter 942, Local And Private Laws Of 2012, To Provide That Nongovernmental Trustee Members Of The City Of Oxford Municipal Reserve And Trust Fund Shall No Longer Receive Per Diem; To Provide That The Trustees Of The Fund Shall Manage Income Of The Fund Rather Than Interest Income; To Define The Earnings Component As 3% Every Fiscal Year Rather Than Just The First Three Fiscal Years; To Provide That Such Earnings Component Shall Be Equal To 3% Of The Amount Of The Full Fund Balance Whether Or Not The Corpus Component Has Generated Any Income That Fiscal Year; To Provide That All Remaining Portions Of The Annual Income Earned From The Investment Of The Fund Shall Remain In The Fund As Part Of The Corpus Component; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Oxford; make certain revisions to the management of Municipal Reserve and Trust Fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Mayo [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2013-04-02 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-04-01 | House | Immediate Release |
2013-04-01 | House | Passed |
2013-04-01 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-03-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-03-27 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |