MS HB1744 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Coahoma County, Mississippi, To Construct Or Acquire A County Jail Anywhere Within The County; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Coahoma County; authorize to construct or acquire a county jail anywhere in the county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2016-04-07 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-04-06 | House | Passed |
2016-03-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-03-15 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |