MS HB1751 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Grenada County, Mississippi, To Contract For The Housing Of Inmates With Any Other County Or Private Jail Facility That Is Located Within The State Of Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Grenada County; authorize to contract for the housing of inmates from other county or private jails that are located in this state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2017-03-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | Passed |
2017-03-07 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |