MS HB1777 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Conferees Named Hopson,Turner-Ford,Seymour
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Conferees Named Hopson,Turner-Ford,Seymour
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Approving The Expenditure Of Special Funds For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The State Board Of Registration For Professional Engineers And Land Surveyors For Fiscal Year 2025.
Title
Appropriation; Engineers and Land Surveyors, Board of Registration for Professional.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Bounds [R] | Rep. John Read [R] | Rep. Brent Anderson [R] | Rep. Bryant Clark [D] |
Rep. Casey Eure [R] | Rep. Jeff Hale [R] | Rep. Lataisha Jackson [D] | Rep. Orlando Paden [D] |
Rep. Bill Pigott [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Turner-Ford,Seymour |
2024-04-15 | House | Conferees Named Bounds,Read,Boyd (19th) |
2024-04-15 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2024-03-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-14 | House | Passed |
2024-03-13 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-13 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To A1 |
2024-03-13 | House | DR - TSDP: A1 To AP |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred To Appropriations B;Appropriations A |