MS HB1968 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Due From Governor 05/02/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Due From Governor 05/02/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Humphreys County, Mississippi, To Contribute Funds To The City Of Belzoni, Mississippi, And To The Towns Of Isola And Louise, Mississippi, To Provide Park And Recreational Facilities And Activities To Such Municipalities, Which Will Benefit The Residents Of The County; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Humphreys County; authorize contributions to Belzoni, Louise and Isola for parks and recreation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Due From Governor 05/02/24 | |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Passed |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2024-04-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-04-10 | House | Passed |
2024-04-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-25 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |