MS HB325 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide That A Right Of First Refusal In Real Property Is Extinguished Upon The Death Of The Grantee Unless The Instrument Granting The Right Or A Memorandum Of The Contractual Agreement Or Instrument Clearly States That Upon The Grantee's Death, It Shall Inure To The Benefit Of The Grantee's Heirs And Assigns; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Real property; right of first refusal expires on grantee's death unless specifically stated otherwise.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Passed |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2024-03-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed |
2024-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |