MS HB411 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 67-1-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of The Term "qualified Resort Area" Under The Local Option Alcoholic Beverage Control Law To Include The Second Judicial District Of Hinds County, Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages; revise definition of "qualified resort area" under the Local Option Alcoholic Beverage Control Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 77 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2017-02-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-02-02 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2017-02-01 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Dixon, Smith, Lamar) |
2017-02-01 | House | Passed |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2017-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2017-01-05 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |