MS HB625 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-14 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-14 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-9-49, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Local School Boards To Permit The Local Superintendent Of Education To Deduct From The Salary Of Certain Employees Of The School District Certain Dues For Membership In Professional Organizations; To Provide That The Dues Deduction Be Made Only Upon Receipt Of Written Authorization From The Employee Requesting The Deduction; To Require Local School Boards Authorizing Such Deduction To Adopt Policies And Procedures Implementing The Dues Deductions Process Before Any Dues Are Deducted; And For Related Purposes.
Title
School district employees; authorize voluntary dues deductions for membership in professional organizations.
Sponsors
Rep. Cecil Brown [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-02 - House - House Failed (Y: 59 N: 60 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-14 | Died On Calendar | |
2011-02-02 | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Brown, Thomas) | |
2011-02-02 | Failed | |
2011-01-24 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-13 | Referred To Education |