MS HB666 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 69-24-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Time During Which Distributors Of Soil Or Plant Amendments Must Submit Statements On Net Tonnage Distributed In The State To The Commissioner Of Agriculture And Commerce From A Quarterly Basis To An Annual Basis; And For Related Purposes.
Title
"Mississippi Soil and Plant Amendment Law"; revise to require annual reporting of net tonnage distributed in the state.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Pigott [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Agriculture |
2018-02-02 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-01 | House | Passed |
2018-01-16 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred To Agriculture |