MS HB673 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-3-54, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Title Of The Human Trafficking Act For Clarity; To Amend Section 97-3-54.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Penalties For Human Trafficking And Specify Additional Elements Of The Offense Of Human Trafficking; To Amend Section 97-3-54.3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; To Amend Section 97-3-54.4, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Definitions; To Create New Section 97-3-54.5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Use Of Undercover Operatives To Investigate Suspected Human Trafficking; To Create New Section 97-3-54.6, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Injunctive And Other Relief For Victims And To Require Confidentiality; To Create New Section 97-3-54.7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Forfeiture Of Assets Used In Furtherance Of Trafficking And To Provide For The Disposition Of Proceeds Of Forfeiture; To Create New Section 97-3-54.8, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Create The "relief For Victims Of Human Trafficking Fund"; To Create New Section 97-3-54.9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Create The Position Of Statewide Human Trafficking Coordinator; To Amend Section 97-29-49, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Elements And Punishment For The Offense Of Prostitution; To Amend Section 97-29-51, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Elements And Punishment For The Offense Of Soliciting Prostitution; To Repeal Section 97-29-53, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Sets Forth The Punishment For Prostitution And Solicitation; To Amend Section 97-43-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Definitions In The Racketeering Act; To Amend Sections 97-5-5 And 97-5-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform The Offenses Of Enticement Of A Minor To The Tenor Of This Act; To Amend Section 97-5-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform Dissemination Of Sexually Oriented Material; To Amend Section 97-5-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform The Offense Of Computer-luring; To Amend Section 99-1-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, As Amended By House Bill No. 709, 2013 Regular Session, To Revise The Statute Of Limitations For The Prosecution Of Domestic Violence And Human Trafficking Cases; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Human Trafficking; revise law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Conferees Named Bryan,Wiggins,Hopson |
2013-03-25 | House | Conferees Named Buck (72nd),Byrd,Gipson |
2013-03-15 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Amended |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2013-02-18 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-14 | House | Passed |
2013-02-14 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-02-13 | House | Read the Third Time |
2013-02-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |