MS HB697 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Mississippi Aviation Safety Act; To Define Terminology; To Provide That Beginning July 1, 2024, The Owning Entity Of All Existing Or Newly Constructed Covered Towers And Structures That Have Height Measurements Of More Than 50 Feet But Less Than 200 Feet Shall Cause Such Tower Or Structure To Be Clearly Marked Consistent With Applicable Guidance In The Faa Advisory Circular (ac 70/7460 Il) To Require The Owning Entity Of A Newly Constructed Structure, Before The Completion Of Construction Of The Structure To Disclose The Height, The Precise Location Of Latitudinal And Longitudinal Coordinates Of The Covered Tower Or Structure And The Type Of Obstruction Marking Or Lighting To The Appropriate Entity By Electronic Communication With The Appropriate Entities; To Require The Appropriate Entities Keep Their Databases Current To Protect Any Proprietary Information Contained Therein; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Aviation Safety Act; create.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Passed |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |
2024-02-21 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-02-20 | House | Passed |
2024-02-14 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-01-29 | House | Referred To Transportation |