MS HB708 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 99-19-73, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Criminal Assessment For The Vulnerable Persons Training, Investigation And Prosecution Trust Fund And The Cyber-crime Unit Fund; To Repeal Section 9, Chapter 549, Laws Of 2008, Which Repeals Sections 41-59-3, 41-59-5, 41-59-7, 41-59-75, 27-19-43 And 99-19-73, Mississippi Code Of 1972, On July 1, 2011; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State assessments; increase amount for Vulnerable Persons Fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Baker [R] | Rep. Cecil Brown [D] | Rep. Kimberly Campbell [D] | Rep. Frances Fredericks [D] |
Rep. Adrienne Wooten [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 83 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 65 N: 54 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 65 N: 54 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-04-05 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-04-01 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-29 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-29 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-28 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-28 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-16 | Conferees Named Tollison,Albritton,Blount | |
2011-03-09 | Conferees Named Blackmon,Cockerham,Baker (74th) | |
2011-03-08 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2011-03-03 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-03-02 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-02 | Amended | |
2011-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-01-27 | Referred To Judiciary, Division B | |
2011-01-26 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-01-25 | Passed | |
2011-01-19 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-13 | Referred To Judiciary A |