MS HB708 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 73-21-153, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of The Term "health Insurance Plan" And Define The Term "pharmacy Benefit Manager Affiliate" For The Purposes Of The Pharmacy Benefit Prompt Pay Act; To Amend Section 73-21-155, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Reduce The Period Of Time Within Which All Benefits Payable Under A Pharmacy Benefit Management Plan Must Be Paid From Fifteen Days To Seven Days; To Prohibit Pharmacy Benefit Managers From Retroactively Denying Or Reducing A Claim Or Aggregate Of Claims After The Claim Or Aggregate Of Claims Has Been Adjudicated; To Create New Section 73-21-156, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Specify The Circumstances Under Which A Pharmacy Benefit Manager May Place A Drug On A Maximum Allowable Cost List; To Require Pharmacy Benefit Managers To Provide Access To Their Maximum Allowable Cost List To Each Pharmacy Subject To The List, Update The List On A Timely Basis, And Provide A Process For Each Pharmacy Subject To The List To Receive Prompt Notification Of An Update To The List; To Require Pharmacy Benefit Managers To Provide An Administrative Appeal Procedure To Allow Pharmacies To Challenge A Maximum Allowable Cost List And Reimbursements Made Under Such A List; To Prohibit Pharmacy Benefit Managers From Reimbursing A Pharmacy Or Pharmacist An Amount Less Than The Amount That The Manager Reimburses A Pharmacy Benefit Manager Affiliate For Providing The Same Pharmacist Services; To Amend Section 73-21-157, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Provision Relating To Disclosure Of Proprietary Information By Pharmacy Benefit Managers To The State Board Of Pharmacy; To Require The Board To Destroy Or Delete All Such Information Thirty Days After The Board Determines That The Information Is No Longer Necessary Or Useful; To Provide That Any Person Who Knowingly Releases Any Such Information Shall Be Subject To A Monetary Penalty Imposed By The Board; To Provide That All Employees Of The Board Who Have Access To Such Information Shall Be Fingerprinted And Undergo A Criminal History Records Check; To Prohibit Pharmacy Benefit Managers Or Third-party Payors From Requiring Pharmacy Accreditation Standards Or Recertification Requirements Inconsistent With, More Stringent Than, Or In Addition To Federal And State Requirements For Licensure As A Pharmacy In This State; To Create New Section 73-21-161, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit Pharmacies, Pharmacy Benefit Managers And Pharmacy Benefit Manager Affiliates From Ordering Of A Patient To A Pharmacy By A Pharmacy Benefit Manager Affiliate, Offering Or Implementing Plan Designs That Require Patients To Use Affiliated Pharmacies, Patient Or Prospective Patient Specific Advertising, Marketing Or Promotion Of A Pharmacy By An Affiliate; To Require Resident And Nonresident Pharmacies That Have Affiliates To Annually File With The Board A Disclosure Statement Identifying All Such Affiliates; To Create New Section 73-21-163, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Board To Bring Court Actions For Temporary Or Permanent Injunctions To Prohibit A Pharmacy Benefit Manager Or Pharmacy Benefit Manager Affiliate From Using Any Method, Act Or Practice Prohibited In The Pharmacy Benefit Prompt Pay Act; To Authorize The Board To Impose A Monetary Penalty On A Pharmacy Benefit Manager Or Pharmacy Benefit Manager Affiliate For Noncompliance With The Provisions Of The Pharmacy Benefit Prompt Pay Act; To Amend Sections 73-21-151 And 73-21-159, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Provisions Of This Act; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacy Benefit Prompt Pay Act; revise various provisions of.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-17 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29 Approved by Governor
2020-06-23SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-22HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-17HouseConcurred in Amend From Senate
2020-06-11SenateReturned For Concurrence
2020-06-10SenatePassed As Amended
2020-06-10SenateAmended
2020-06-03SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2020-05-11SenateReferred To Public Health and Welfare
2020-03-06HouseTransmitted To Senate
2020-03-04HousePassed As Amended
2020-03-04HouseAmended
2020-02-20HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-02-10HouseReferred To Public Health and Human Services

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback