MS HB901 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Direct The State Fiscal Officer To Transfer Certain Amounts To The Budget Contingency Fund From Certain Special Funds During Fiscal Year 2014; To Amend Section 43-13-405, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On The Statute That Establishes The Health Care Trust Fund; To Amend Section 43-13-407, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On The Statute That Establishes The Health Care Expendable Fund; To Provide That The Total Amount Of The Tobacco Settlement Installment Payment In Calendar Year 2013 Shall Be Deposited Into The Health Care Expendable Fund; To Provide That A Certain Sum Shall Be Transferred From The Health Care Trust Fund To The Health Care Expendable Fund During Fiscal Year 2014; To Authorize The Executive Director Of The Department Of Finance And Administration To Transfer Not More Than Certain Amounts From The Capital Expense Fund For The Purpose Of Paying The Cost Of Repairs Of Damage Caused By The Hail Storm On March 18, 2013, And For The Purpose Of Providing The Funds Necessary To Continue The Operations Of The Magic Project; To Require That Any Funds Transferred For Those Purposes Shall Be Transferred Back To The Capital Expense Fund Not Later Than June 30, 2014; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State funds; transfer certain to BCF, and transfer sum from Health Care Trust Fund to Expendable Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 90 N: 18 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 90 N: 18 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-03 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2013-04-02 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2013-04-02 | House | Reconsidered |
2013-04-02 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Frierson, Huddleston (15th)) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2013-04-02 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2013-04-01 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Brown,Tindell |
2013-03-25 | House | Conferees Named Frierson,Huddleston (15th),Flaggs |
2013-03-19 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Amended |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2013-02-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed |
2013-02-12 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-02-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To Appropriations |