MS HC103 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Kimberly Sanchez Of Biloxi, Mississippi, On Being Named A Distinguished Finalist In The 2015 Prudential Spirit Of Community Awards.
Title
Kimberly Sanchez; commend upon being named a Distinguished Finalist in the 2015 Prudential Spirit Community Awards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-30 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2015-03-25 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-03-25 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-03-25 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-24 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred To Rules |