MS HC106 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Loss And Commemorating The Life And Legacy Of Dr. Maria Luisa Alvarez Harvey.
Title
Dr. Maria Luisa Alvarez Harvey; mourn the loss and commemorate life of.
Sponsors
Rep. Earle Banks [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-25 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-25 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-30 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-03-25 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2017-03-25 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-03-25 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-03-25 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-24 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-03-24 | House | Referred To Rules |