MS HC121 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Civil Air Patrol Upon The Auspicious Occasion Of Its 75th Anniversary And Recognizing The Week Of November 27 Through December 3, 2016, As Civil Air Patrol Week Throughout The State Of Mississippi.
Title
Civil Air Patrol; recognize and commend observance of its 75th anniversary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2016-04-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-04-15 | House | Immediate Release |
2016-04-15 | House | Adopted |
2016-04-14 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-04-12 | House | Referred To Rules |