MS HC123 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Commending The Heroic And Inspirational Achievements Of Patrick Hardison While In The Line Of Duty And During The Most Extensive Face Transplant Surgery Performed To Date.
Title
Patrick Hardison; commend heroism of.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lamar [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2016-04-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-04-15 | House | Immediate Release |
2016-04-15 | House | Adopted |
2016-04-14 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-04-12 | House | Referred To Rules |