MS HC130 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Ocean Springs High School Dance Team For Winning The 2010 Class 6a State Dance Championship In Both The Pom Category And Jazz Category.
Title
Ocean Springs High School Dance Team; commend on winning the 2010 Class 6A Championship in both Pom and Jazz categories.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-28 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-03-28 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-28 | Adopted | |
2011-03-27 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-03-24 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-03-24 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-24 | Adopted | |
2011-03-23 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-03-23 | Referred To Rules |