MS HC14 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Passed on February 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-09 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Passed on February 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-09 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commemorating The Centennial Anniversary Of Mississippi Gulf Coast Community College And Congratulating The Institution For Its Distinguished Legacy Of Excellence In Post-secondary Educational Advancements.
Title
Mississippi Gulf Coast Community College; commemorate the centennial anniversary of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-02-09 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-02-08 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-02-08 | Immediate Release | |
2012-02-08 | Adopted | |
2012-02-07 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-02-01 | Referred To Rules | |
2012-01-31 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-01-31 | Immediate Release | |
2012-01-31 | Adopted | |
2012-01-30 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-01-30 | Referred To Rules |