MS HC16 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Mr. Steven R. White Of The Branch Community Of Morton, Mississippi, And Educator At Rosa Scott School In Madison, Mississippi, Upon Being Named One Of Two Mississippi Recipients Of The National Council For Geographic Education K-12 Distinguished Teaching Award For Excellence In Geography Teaching.
Title
Steven R. White; commend upon being named recipient of NCGE's Distinguished Teaching Award.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-02-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2014-01-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2014-01-14 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-01-14 | House | Adopted |
2014-01-13 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-01-13 | House | Referred To Rules |