MS HC16 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Neshoba Central High School Slow-pitch Softball Team And Head Coach Trae Embry Upon Winning Their Fifth Mississippi High School Activities Association Class 5a-6a Slow-pitch Softball State Championship.
Title
Neshoba Central "Lady Rockets" Softball Team; commend for winning MHSAA Class 5A-6A slow-pitch softball state championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-01-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2017-01-19 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-01-18 | House | Adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-16 | House | Referred To Rules |