MS HC45 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The George County High School Lady Rebels Fast Pitch Softball Team And Head Coach Kasey Mccann Upon Winning Their First Ever Mississippi High School Activities Association Class 5a Fast Pitch Softball State Championship.
Title
George County High School; commend upon winning first ever MHSAA Class 5A Fast Pitch Softball State Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-16 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Adopted |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2024-04-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-04-04 | House | Adopted |
2024-04-02 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-02-28 | House | Referred To Rules |