MS HC52 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Downtown Tupelo Main Street Association And The Mississippi Department Of Environmental Quality For Their Outstanding Efforts In Successfully Transforming A Contaminated Former Dry Cleaning Site Into The Popular Downtown Fairpark District In Tupelo, Mississippi, And Congratulating Them For Their Receipt Of A Phoenix Award In Recognition Of This Important Work.
Title
Downtown Tupelo Main Street Association and MDEQ; commend efforts of successfully transforming a contaminated area of city.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-29 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-23 | Died In Committee | |
2010-01-29 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-01-29 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-01-29 | Immediate Release | |
2010-01-29 | Adopted | |
2010-01-28 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-01-27 | Referred To Rules |