MS HC99 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-07 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-07 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Academic And Athletic Success Of Jermaine Whitehead Of Greenwood, Mississippi, And Congratulating Him Upon Signing A National Letter Of Intent To Play Football With The 2011 Bowl Championship Series National Champion Auburn University Tigers.
Title
Jermaine Whitehead; commend academic and athletic success and congratulate upon signing with Auburn University.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-11 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | Died In Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-03-11 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-03-11 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-11 | Adopted | |
2011-03-10 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-03-10 | Referred To Rules |