MS HR1 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending The Life And Legacy Of Mrs. Natalie Crawford Stovall-frady And Expressing Deepest Sympathy To Her Family And Friends Upon Her Passing.
Title
Mrs. Natalie Crawford Stovall-Frady; commend life and legacy upon her passing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-01-18 | House | Adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-16 | House | Referred To Rules |