MS HR105 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending The Life, Legacy And Contributions Of Mrs. Cheryl "cheri" Merritt Barry Expressing Sincerest Sympathy Upon Her Passing.
Title
Cheryl "Cheri" Merritt Barry; commend life and legacy upon her passing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-08 | House | Adopted |
2024-04-05 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-04-02 | House | Referred To Rules |