MS HR115 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending The Distinguished Career And Meritorious Leadership And Service That Mr. Scott Griffith Provided To The Students, Faculty And Staff Of Presbyterian Christian School As Elementary Principal Upon The Occasion Of His Retirement.
Title
Scott Griffith; commend upon occasion of his retirement as Elementary Principal of Presbyterian Christian School.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-15 | House | Adopted |
2024-04-10 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-04-09 | House | Referred To Rules |