MS HR91 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating Lillian Lilly Upon This Historic Occasion Of The Production Of Her First Music Video And Recognizing Her Years Of Service In The Gospel Music Industry.
Title
Lillian Lilly; commend upon the production of her first music video and recognize years of service in gospel music industry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-04 | House | Adopted |
2024-04-02 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-03-20 | House | Referred To Rules |