MS HR97 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Students, Graduates, Parents, Teachers And Administration Of The Biloxi Public School District On The Occasion Of Their 150th Anniversary Celebration.
Title
Biloxi Public School District; commend on the occasion of its 150th anniversary celebration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-21 | Immediate Release | |
2010-04-21 | Adopted | |
2010-04-20 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-03-27 | Referred To Rules |