MS SB2006 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-105-305, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide County Boards Of Supervisors The Discretion To Determine The Interval Of Time For Providing Notice To Financial Institutions Of The Opening Of The Bidding Process For Serving As Depositories Of County Funds; To Clarify That The Selection Of Depositories Is To Be Based Upon All Relevant Factors; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Depositories; revise bid process for selection by counties and municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | House | Died In Committee |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;County Affairs |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Passed |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-27 | Senate | DR - TSDP: CA To AC |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Referred To County Affairs;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |