MS SB2048 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Winona, Mississippi, To Levy A Tax Upon The Gross Proceeds Of Sales Of Restaurants For The Purpose Of Providing Funds To Promote Recreation, Tourism, Parks And Economic Development Within The City; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Winona; authorize the imposition of a tax on restaurants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 14 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-04-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-21 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-04-19 | House | Passed |
2016-04-17 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-04-16 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Passed |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2016-04-12 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: LP To FI |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private;Finance |