MS SB2055 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-135-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Mississippi Students Participating In The Southern Regional Education Board (sreb) Contract Program At Any College Of Optometry Outside Of The State Shall Not Be Required To Return To The State Of Mississippi To Practice After Graduation; And For Related Purposes.
Title
SREB contract program at out-of-state college of optometry; students not required to practice in Mississippi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | House | Died In Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred To Universities and Colleges;Public Health and Human Services |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-02-05 | Senate | DR - TSDP: UC To PH |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Referred To Universities and Colleges;Public Health and Welfare |