MS SB2107 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-6-171, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Statute Requiring Legislative Drafting Offices And State Agencies To Use Certain "person First" References To Individuals With Disabilities; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Individuals with disabilities; require statutes and regulations to use "person first" references.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-04-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-31 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-30 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-27 | House | Conferees Named Mims,Hood,Clark |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Conferees Named Kirby,Burton,Bryan |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2015-03-12 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-11 | House | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-11 | House | Amended |
2015-03-09 | House | Read the Third Time |
2015-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Passed |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |